Global patent index - EP 1024274 A2

EP 1024274 A2 2000-08-02 - Accumulation-type fuel injection system and accumulation chamber pressure control method therefor

Title (en)

Accumulation-type fuel injection system and accumulation chamber pressure control method therefor

Title (de)

Speicherkraftstoffeinspritzsystem und Verfahren zur Regelung des Kraftstoffdruckes dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible à accumulateur et méthode de commande de pression associé

Publication

EP 1024274 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100432 A

Priority

  • JP 1992499 A
  • JP 20447099 A

Abstract (en)

A spill control valve such as an electromagnetic valve (1a) of an injector (1) is ineffectively driven to open for a period (Tq) shorter than a delay period (tm) by which a nozzle needle (37) opens, when a pressure reducing condition to reduce fuel pressure in a common rail (3) is satisfied. A temperature of an injector driving circuit (79) in an ECU (7) is estimated from a coolant temperature detected by a coolant temperature sensor (71). A cycle period of an ineffective driving is determined from the estimated temperature so that a thermal load applied to the injector driving circuit does not exceed a limit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3872 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2065 (2013.01); F02D 2041/389 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024274 A2 20000802; EP 1024274 A3 20020327; EP 1024274 B1 20040324; DE 60009180 D1 20040429; DE 60009180 T2 20050120; JP 2000282998 A 20001010; JP 3458776 B2 20031020

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-03-09 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009180

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI