Global Patent Index - EP 1024283 A2

EP 1024283 A2 2000-08-02 - Starter device for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Starter device for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Anlasservorrichtung für Verbrennungsmotoren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de démarrage pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1024283 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100643 A

Priority

IT MI990151 A

Abstract (en)

A starter device for internal combustion engines comprises a drive shaft (11), a control assembly (13) for a pinion gear (17) rotatingly and axially movable on the driver shaft (11), and a centrifugally actuated locking unit (16) fastened to the drive shaft (11) to retaing the control assembly (13) from backward sliding during starting of the engine. The control assembly (13) comprises the pinion gear (17), and a thrust element (19) coupled to the drive shaft (11) by helical splines (21), and an intermediate unidirectional roller clutch (20). The centrifugally actuated locking unit (16) comprises face to face arranged locking members (26, 27) radially sliding into an open cage (25) fastened to rotate with the drive shaft (11). Each locking member (26, 27) is provided with an arch-shaped weight portion (30) and a tooth member (32) to stop the thrust element (19), connected by at least one intermediate arm (31). Guide means (33, 34; 42) are provided on the locking members (26, 27) and the guide cage (25) to radially guide the same locking members (26, 27) during movement under centrifugal forces. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/02 (2006.01); F02N 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/065 (2013.01); F02N 15/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024283 A2 20000802; EP 1024283 A3 20020807; IT 1307647 B1 20011114; IT MI990151 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060801

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI