Global Patent Index - EP 1024291 A2

EP 1024291 A2 2000-08-02 - Multistage pump for supplying semi-solid material

Title (en)

Multistage pump for supplying semi-solid material

Title (de)

Mehrstufige Pumpe zur Förderung von halbfestem Material

Title (fr)

Pompe multiétage pour le tranfert de materiau semi-solide

Publication

EP 1024291 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200272 A

Priority

IT TV990005 U

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a pump for supplying fluids such as musts together with the marc, in which a first impeller (6) with a biconvex shape is supplied by a feeder screw (3) mounted on the same shaft (8). The pump also comprises a second biconvex impeller (7) mounted downstream of the first impeller on the same shaft and staggered at 90 DEG with respect thereto; the two impellers are housed inside respective chambers (10, 11) which communicate at the top and at the bottom so as to allow the material to pass from one chamber to the other. The pump thus constructed has an efficiency which is greater than that which can be obtained with a single impeller housed inside a corresponding chamber with a capacity equivalent to that of both the communicating chambers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 7/04; F04D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 1/06 (2006.01); F04D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 1/06 (2013.01); F04D 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT 229226 U

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024291 A2 20000802; EP 1024291 A3 20001108; IT 248089 Y1 20021210; IT TV990005 U1 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GR IT PT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI