Global Patent Index - EP 1024328 A3

EP 1024328 A3 2001-04-11 - Gas burner for cooking hob

Title (en)

Gas burner for cooking hob

Title (de)

Gasbrenner für flache Kochmulden

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz pour plan de cuisson

Publication

EP 1024328 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99126263 A

Priority

DE 29901504 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024328A2] The gas burner for a ceramic hob has an elbow joint (5) forming a nozzle support and gas supply duct on which is mounted a cooker plate. The elbow joint has a connecting plate (10) fixed to the rear face of the ceramic hob plate (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01); F24C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/103 (2013.01); F23D 14/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29901504 U1 20000621; EP 1024328 A2 20000802; EP 1024328 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI