Global Patent Index - EP 1024329 A2

EP 1024329 A2 2000-08-02 - Display module for Household appliance

Title (en)

Display module for Household appliance

Title (de)

Anzeigemodul für Haushaltsgeräte

Title (fr)

Module d'affichage pour appareil ménager

Publication

EP 1024329 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101187 A

Priority

DE 19903221 A

Abstract (en)

The display module (50) has a display device mounted behind an at least partially transparent front panel so as to be essentially parallel to it. The display module is pressed against the rear of the front panel by an elastic positioning arrangement (80) and is secured in a module housing by at least one attachment arrangement. is also included for a display and control module with a module housing.

Abstract (de)

Ein erfindungsgemäßes Anzeigemodul (50) für Haushaltsgeräte, insbesondere Herde, umfaßt eine Anzeigevorrichtung, die hinter einer zumindest teilweise transparenten Frontplatte im wesentlichen parallel zu dieser angeordnet ist. Das Anzeigemodul ist mit einer Halterungsanordnung, vorzugsweise einem Ausleuchtrahmen (54), versehen und um eine zur Frontplatte im wesentlichen parallel verlaufende Achse nach vorne und nach hinten verschwenkbar angeordnet. Hierzu sind vorzugsweise am Ausleuchtrahmen (54) Lagerzapfen (52) seitlich angeformt, die in einen Anzeigehalter (56) eingesetzt sind, der in Richtung zur Frontplatte hin federbeaufschlagt und durch einen rückwärtigen Rasthaken (78) im Modulgehäuse (2) gesichert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024329 A2 20000802; EP 1024329 A3 20040811; DE 19903221 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060216

2005-05-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI