Global Patent Index - EP 1024369 A1

EP 1024369 A1 2000-08-02 - Characterization of a semiconductor-dielectric interface by photocurrent measurements

Title (en)

Characterization of a semiconductor-dielectric interface by photocurrent measurements

Title (de)

Charakterisierung einer Halbleiter-Dielektrikum-Grenzschicht mittels Photostrom-Messungen

Title (fr)

Caractérisation d'une interface semi-conducteur-diélectrique par mesure de photocourants

Publication

EP 1024369 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830030 A

Priority

EP 99830030 A

Abstract (en)

In a method for characterizing a semiconductor/substrate/dielectric layer interface through measurements of a photocurrent induced in the semiconductor by scanning a certain area of the interface with a laser beam and collected by way of a Schottky contact established by inversely biasing in respect to the potential of the bulk of the semiconductor substrate an electrolyte capable of etching any native or thermal oxide that may exist on the contact area with the semiconductor substrate, the surface potential of the semiconductor/dielectric interface is controlled by means of a gate electrode established on the dielectric layer by way of a second electrolyte not aggressive of the dielectric material and biased by an electrode immersed in the second electrolyte in respect to the potential of the bulk of the semiconductor substrate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 31/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/26 (2006.01); G01R 31/265 (2006.01); H01L 21/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/2656 (2013.01); G01R 31/2648 (2013.01); H01L 22/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5130643 A 19920714 - FOELL HELMUT [DE], et al
  • [A] US 4420497 A 19831213 - TICKLE ANDREW C [US]
  • [A] US 4433288 A 19840221 - MOORE ARNOLD R [US]
  • [DA] V. LEHMANN ET AL.: "Minority carrier diffusion length mapping in silicon wafers using a Si-electrolyte-contact", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY., vol. 135, no. 11, November 1988 (1988-11-01), MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, pages 2831 - 2835, XP002107593

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024369 A1 20000802; EP 1024369 B1 20041020; DE 69921286 D1 20041125; US 6437592 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080126

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69921286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CHARACTERIZATION OF A SEMICONDUCTOR-DIELECTRIC INTERFACE BY PHOTOCURRENT MEASUREMENTS

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031104

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI