Global patent index - EP 1024416 A2

EP 1024416 A2 2000-08-02 - Chronograph

Title (en)

Chronograph

Title (de)

Chronograph

Title (fr)

Chronographe

Publication

EP 1024416 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99124526 A

Priority

CH 15899 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes blocking elements isolating and locking the display during reading of detailed timings. The chronograph comprises a secondary display (16,17) which shows fractions of a section. This co-operates with an operating mechanism (20) comprising a 'snail' gear (21) driven by a chronograph mechanism (4). A push rod (19) acts on the activating elements (40,46) to release a main pivoting element (30) which changes fraction of a second measuring on the snail gear, by means of a drive train (33). A first blocking device (58) allows the isolation of the striker (54) of the chronograph to prevent a return to zero during the reading of a fraction of a second. A second blocking device (59) inhibits a re-start of the chronograph during this reading, and prevents a re-starting of the activating mechanism (20) during the operation of the chronograph. A third element (66) blocks the snail gear during the reading of the fraction of a second.

Abstract (fr)

Le chronographe comprend un affichage secondaire (16, 17) des fractions de seconde coopérant avec un mécanisme d'actionnement (20) comportant un limaçon (21) entraînée par un mécanisme chronographe (4). Un poussoir (19) agit sur des organes de mise en action (40, 46) pour libérer une bascule principale (30) qui relève la fraction de seconde chronométrée sur le limaçon (21) par un tenon (35) et entraîne une aiguille d'affichage (16) au moyen d'un train d'engrenage (33). Des premiers moyens de blocage (58) permettent d'isoler le marteau (54) du chronographe pour empêcher une mise à zéro pendant la lecture de la fraction de seconde. Des seconds moyens de blocage (59) inhibent un départ du chronographe pendant cette lecture et empêche une mise en action du mécanisme d'actionnement (20) pendant la marche du chronographe. Des troisièmes moyens (66) bloquent le limaçon (21) pendant la lecture des fractions de seconde. On obtient ainsi une lecture des fractions de seconde chronométrées à la demande de l'utilisateur d'une grande fiabilité et précision mécanique sans risque d'endommager des pièces du chronographe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04F 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024416 A2 20000802; EP 1024416 A3 20010418; CH 696713 A5 20071015

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050701

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI