Global Patent Index - EP 1024416 A3

EP 1024416 A3 2001-04-18 - Chronograph

Title (en)

Chronograph

Title (de)

Chronograph

Title (fr)

Chronographe

Publication

EP 1024416 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99124526 A

Priority

CH 15899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024416A2] The device includes blocking elements isolating and locking the display during reading of detailed timings. The chronograph comprises a secondary display (16,17) which shows fractions of a section. This co-operates with an operating mechanism (20) comprising a 'snail' gear (21) driven by a chronograph mechanism (4). A push rod (19) acts on the activating elements (40,46) to release a main pivoting element (30) which changes fraction of a second measuring on the snail gear, by means of a drive train (33). A first blocking device (58) allows the isolation of the striker (54) of the chronograph to prevent a return to zero during the reading of a fraction of a second. A second blocking device (59) inhibits a re-start of the chronograph during this reading, and prevents a re-starting of the activating mechanism (20) during the operation of the chronograph. A third element (66) blocks the snail gear during the reading of the fraction of a second.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04F 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024416 A2 20000802; EP 1024416 A3 20010418; CH 696713 A5 20071015

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI