Global Patent Index - EP 1024445 A2

EP 1024445 A2 2000-08-02 - Method of generating presentation data from a dynamic database

Title (en)

Method of generating presentation data from a dynamic database

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Präsentationsdaten aus einem dynamischen Datenbestand

Title (fr)

Méthode de génération de données de présentation à partir d'une banque de données dynamique

Publication

EP 1024445 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124193 A

Priority

DE 19903648 A

Abstract (en)

The data are supplied to a data sink consisting of a dynamic data stock that is updated by a data flow from a data source. New presentation data are produced from the dynamic data stock dependent on the data flow. The data sink is a downstream data processing application and/or a data display or screen. The data flow is a continuous data/message flow which changes a number of data of the dynamic data stock. New presentation data are generated from the dynamic data stock if the number of data of the stock remains constant fro a predetermined time.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Präsentationsdaten, welche einer Datensenke, aus einem dynamischen Datenbestand zugeführten werden, welcher durch einen Datenfluss aus einer Datenquelle aktualisiert wird. Hierbei wird die Erzeugung neuer Präsentationsdaten aus dem dynamischen Datenbestand in Abhängigkeit vom Datenfluss durchgeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/25 (2008.01); H04H 60/27 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/27 (2013.01); H04H 60/25 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024445 A2 20000802; EP 1024445 A3 20050202; DE 19903648 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071102

2005-10-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-09-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI