Global patent index - EP 1024461 A1

EP 1024461 A1 2000-08-02 - Autonomous and multifunctional system for the preparation of mail

Title (en)

Autonomous and multifunctional system for the preparation of mail

Title (de)

Multifunktionelles autonomes System zur Vorbereitung von Post

Title (fr)

Système autonome multifonctions de préparation de courrier

Publication

EP 1024461 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400221 A

Priority

FR 9901020 A

Abstract (en)

The printer feeds the letter and envelope directly into a folding machine. The system comprises a general use computer for preparing a document for dispatch and a secure franking system. A digital system (14) is provided for forming an image, and this is connected to the computer for printing both the document for dispatch, and the destination address on an envelope which is intended to receive the document. A folding and inserting machine (16) is connected to the image forming printer, to assembly the document inside the envelope for dispatch. An electronic labelling system is used to keep track of documents, and a copying facility is provided to allow digital copying of documents introduced into the machine. The general use computer is linked to both parts of the machine to provide overall control.

Abstract (fr)

Système autonome multifonctions de préparation d'articles de courrier comprenant un ordinateur à usage général (12) pour élaborer un document à expédier et une information d'affranchissement sécurisée, un dispositif numérique de formation d'image (14) relié à l'ordinateur à usage général pour imprimer à la fois un document à expédier et au moins une adresse d'un destinataire de ce document, à l'exclusion de l'empreinte postale elle même, sur une enveloppe devant recevoir ce document, et une plieuse/inséreuse (16) reliée à la fois au dispositif de formation d'image et à l'ordinateur à usage général pour recevoir et plier le document imprimé et, une fois celui-ci inséré dans l'enveloppe, procéder sélectivement à l'apposition de l'empreinte postale par une opération d'écriture dans un microcircuit inscriptible d'une étiquette électronique portée par l'enveloppe ou le document. Le dispositif de formation d'image peut comporter un module de lecture optique (33) pour permettre une numérisation de documents (32) introduits directement au niveau du dispositif et un module d'envoi de télécopie (36) pour permettre une transmission directe sur un réseau de communication (10) des documents préalablement numérisés par ledit module de lecture optique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00201 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024461 A1 20000802; EP 1024461 B1 20060503; DE 60027616 D1 20060608; DE 60027616 T2 20070524; FR 2789202 A1 20000804; FR 2789202 B1 20010427; US 6741971 B1 20040525

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60027616

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110128

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60027616

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI