Global Patent Index - EP 1024462 A1

EP 1024462 A1 2000-08-02 - Data handling system

Title (en)

Data handling system

Title (de)

Datenverarbeitungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de traitement de données

Publication

EP 1024462 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300549 A

Priority

GB 9901623 A

Abstract (en)

A data handling system particularly for a coin-operated entertainment machine has a base module (1) mounted in the machine and a series of output interface modules (7-9) selectively connected to the base module (1). The output interface modules (7-9) act to supply data collected from the machine to external data reading equipment. By appropriate selection of the interface modules (7-9) different kinds of machines and systems can be accommodated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024462 A1 20000802; GB 0001631 D0 20000315; GB 2347544 A 20000906; GB 2347544 B 20030402; GB 9901623 D0 19990317; ZA 200000337 B 20000821

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCLAUGHLIN, NIGEL

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI