Global Patent Index - EP 1024469 A2

EP 1024469 A2 2000-08-02 - Resealable label

Title (en)

Resealable label

Title (de)

Versigiegelbares Etikett

Title (fr)

Etiquette rescellable

Publication

EP 1024469 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101478 A

Priority

US 23780599 A

Abstract (en)

A self-adhesive label for a container, such as a pharmaceutical bottle, comprises three sections. The first and third sections adhere the label to the bottle. The second section is contiguous with the first section, and is attached to the third section by means of a perforation. This second section is the "peel-away" section and contains printed information on both its front and rear surfaces. The second section has a non-adhesive rear surface and contains a tab for ease of gripping. The second section may be torn along the perforation by use of the grip tab, to enable viewing of the information printed on the rear surface of the second section of the label. The second section can then swing free of the bottle, yet remains attached to the first section. After reading the information contained on the rear surface of the second section, the consumer can than reseal this portion of the label to its original position on the bottle. This is possible due to the presence of relatively minute spots of adhesive on the rear surface of the second label section which will reseal the label to the bottle until such a time as the consumer wishes to reopen the label. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024469 A2 20000802; EP 1024469 A3 20001220; CA 2297193 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 3/10 A, 7G 09F 3/02 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI