Global Patent Index - EP 1024552 A2

EP 1024552 A2 2000-08-02 - Antenna for radio communication terminals

Title (en)

Antenna for radio communication terminals

Title (de)

Antenne für funkbetriebene Kommunikationsendgeräte

Title (fr)

Antenne pour terminaux de radiocommunication sans fil

Publication

EP 1024552 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100221 A

Priority

DE 19903004 A

Abstract (en)

The antenna consists of a combination of one or several different antenna types. Each antenna type can be provided once or several times. The combination of the antennas is fed only at one point. Preferably, the combination includes at least two antenna types of the types planar inverted F-antenna, planar inverted L-antenna or microstrip antenna. The coupling between the antennas can be capacitive, inductive, radiative, or galvanic. The antenna can be integrated in the housing wall of the terminal housing.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Antenne für funkbetriebene Kommunikationsendgeräte. Zur Verwirklichung einer Multibandantenne wird eine aus mehreren unterschiedlichen Antennentypen bestehende Kombination vorgesehen, wobei jeder Antennentyp ein- oder mehrfach vorhanden sein kann und wobei die Kombination aus mehreren Antennen jeweils nur an einem Punkt eingespeist wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/30; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/30 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 5/371 (2013.01); H01Q 5/378 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024552 A2 20000802; EP 1024552 A3 20030507; US 2001050636 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI