Global Patent Index - EP 1024555 A1

EP 1024555 A1 2000-08-02 - Connector adapting to flat contacts and method of mounting this connector

Title (en)

Connector adapting to flat contacts and method of mounting this connector

Title (de)

Verbinder mit Flachkontaktübergang und Montageverfahren dieses Verbinders

Title (fr)

Connecteur avec contacts à report à plat et procédé de montage de ce connecteur

Publication

EP 1024555 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400152 A

Priority

FR 9900969 A

Abstract (en)

The flat circuit connector has two sets of contacts (5,6) with flat sections for mounting to a printed circuit board (3). There are two modules with complementary connections which are plugged in during printed circuit connection using a mechanical guidance key (4).

Abstract (fr)

Le montage d'un connecteur possédant deux rangées de contacts à report à plat parallèles (5,6), à mettre en contact de part et d'autre d'un circuit imprimé (3) nécessite de placer correctement chacune des rangées de chaque côté du circuit imprimé. Pour réussir à placer correctement les rangées de contacts à report à plat de part et d'autre d'un circuit imprimé, on propose de placer l'une après l'autre les rangées de contacts à report à plat sur le circuit imprimé. On associe les deux rangées de contacts du connecteur par l'intermédiaire d'une clé de guidage (4). Chaque rangée de contacts à report à plat est fixée à un module (1,2). L'assemblage des modules réalisé par la clé de guidage forme le connecteur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/20; H01R 13/514

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 13/514 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2013.01); H01R 12/7005 (2013.01); H01R 12/721 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024555 A1 20000802; CA 2297264 A1 20000728; FR 2789233 A1 20000804; FR 2789233 B1 20010413

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020512

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI