Global Patent Index - EP 1024560 A3

EP 1024560 A3 2001-01-03 - Two-part electrical connector

Title (en)

Two-part electrical connector

Title (de)

Zweiteiliger elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique en deux parties

Publication

EP 1024560 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99204554 A

Priority

GB 9901953 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1024560A2] An electrical connector (10) comprising a first part (12) mateable with a second part (14) along an axis (X), the first part including a housing (16) having opposed side walls (18,20) with opposed slide surfaces (28) extending in a direction (Y) substantially perpendicular to the mating axis; a slide member (30,31) making a sliding engagement with the slide surfaces and having a pair of inclined cam surfaces (46); a body member (34) positioned internally of the housing and having through bores (36); and drive means (58,64) on the housing engaging each slide member to slide each slide member relative to the adjacent side wall; the second part including a housing (78) having side walls (80) positionable inside the side walls of the housing of the first part and having through bores (86) a pair of spaced cam followers (84) for sliding movement along the cam surfaces; wherein each slide member has an inclined cam surface (108) extending from its lower edge in a direction substantially parallel to the other inclined cam surfaces; and wherein the first part includes a plate member (100) positioned between the body member and the housing of the second part, the plate member having apertures (102) alignable with the through bores, side edges (104) directed towards the side walls of the housing of the first part, and a cam follower (106) extending from each side edge and slidably engaging the cam surface extending from the lower edge of the adjacent slide member, actuation of the drive means moving the plate member relative to the body member between a fully unmated position in which the plate member is spaced from the body member and a fully mated position in which the plate member is substantially in engagement with the body member. The plate member provides protection for electrical terminals protruding from the body member in the unmated position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629; H01R 13/453

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4538 (2013.01); H01R 13/62905 (2013.01); H01R 13/62933 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024560 A2 20000802; EP 1024560 A3 20010103; EP 1024560 B1 20030611; DE 69908746 D1 20030717; DE 69908746 T2 20040513; GB 9901953 D0 19990317

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908746 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/629 A, 7H 01R 13/453 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI