Global Patent Index - EP 1024680 A2

EP 1024680 A2 2000-08-02 - Device with thick film heater and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Device with thick film heater and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit einem Dickschicht-Heizelement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément chauffant à couche épaisse et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1024680 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101111 A

Priority

DE 19903590 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a thick film heating element (10) supplied with a first supply voltage via two contact surfaces (14,16). A second supply voltage for an auxiliary load can be tapped from a third contact surface (20) on the heating element. is also included for a method of manufacturing a base body for a control unit for an arrangement with a thick film heating element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einer Vorrichtung mit einem Dickschicht-Heizelement (10, 12), das über zwei Kontaktflächen (14, 16) mit einer ersten Versorgungsspannung (18) versorgt wird. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß über zumindest eine zusätzliche Kontaktfläche (20, 22) am Dickschicht-Heizelement (10, 12) eine zweite Versorgungsspannung für einen weiteren Verbraucher (24) abgreifbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/08 (2013.01); H05B 2203/013 (2013.01); H05B 2203/017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1024680 A2 20000802; EP 1024680 A3 20020502; EP 1024680 B1 20050914; DE 19903590 A1 20000803; DE 50011144 D1 20051020; ES 2249203 T3 20060401

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50011144

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249203 T3

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011144 P 20051020

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/26 A, 7H 01C 17/24 B, 7G 01R 1/20 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI