Global Patent Index - EP 1024715 A1

EP 1024715 A1 2000-08-09 - TEXTILE CLOTHING ITEM FOR THE FOOT

Title (en)

TEXTILE CLOTHING ITEM FOR THE FOOT

Title (de)

TEXTILES FUSSBEKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

ARTICLE D'HABILLEMENT TEXTILE POUR LES PIEDS

Publication

EP 1024715 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936422 A

Priority

  • DE 29803582 U
  • EP 9804372 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944449A1] A textile clothing item for the foot made from cloth, woven or knitted fabric, comprising a foot section which encompasses the human foot and extends at least as far as the area of the ankle-joint. The foot sole and/or toe areas of the inventive clothing item are provided with liners or inserts made from a highly elastic, soft padded material placed inside the foot section and solidly connected thereto. The inventive garment can come in the form of a foot, a sock, a knee-stocking, a long stocking, a partial item of clothing for the foot which can be worn underneath a stocking or as a panty hose with a closed foot section as well as a support hose with a fully or partially closed foot section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41B 11/02; A61F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/00 (2006.01); A41B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/02 (2013.01); A41B 11/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944449A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803582 U1 19980618; AT 252329 T 20031115; AU 8542398 A 19990920; EP 1024715 A1 20000809; EP 1024715 B1 20031022; WO 9944449 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120714

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120714

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120714

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 252329 T

- Effective date: 20120714

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: PATENTANWALT DIPL.-ING. (UNI.) WOLFGANG HEISEL;HAUPTSTRASSE 14;8280 KREUZLINGEN (CH)

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALT DIPL. ING. WOLFGANG HEISEL

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040118

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809982 P 20031127

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-06-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE