Global Patent Index - EP 1024737 A1

EP 1024737 A1 2000-08-09 - LENS ARRANGEMENT FOR VITREORETINAL SURGERY

Title (en)

LENS ARRANGEMENT FOR VITREORETINAL SURGERY

Title (de)

LINSENANORDNUNG ZUR VITRORETINALEN CHIRURGIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LENTILLES POUR CHIRURGIE VITREO-RETINIENNE

Publication

EP 1024737 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98956139 A

Priority

  • US 9822317 W
  • US 95552597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920171A1] A lens arrangement for use in vitreous retinal surgery includes a contact lens element (18) including a posterior surface (12) having a shape adapted to fit an average cornea for placement on a patient's eye, and an anterior surface (24). The contact lens element transmits light emanating from the patient's eye for viewing a structure of the patient's eye. A flange (30) surrounds, holds a peripheral region of the contact lens element, and extends radially onto the scleral region of the patient's eye. The flange has a posterior surface with a shape adapted to fit an average scleral curvature so that the flange rests on the sclera for stabilizing a position of the contact lens on the patient's cornea. The flange includes at least one opening (50) allowing access to an incision through which a surgical tool or instrument may be inserted into the eye.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/12 (2006.01); A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61B 3/125 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/007 (2013.01); A61B 3/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920171 A1 19990429; CA 2305892 A1 19990429; CA 2305892 C 20060404; EP 1024737 A1 20000809; EP 1024737 A4 20040303; JP 2001520066 A 20011030; JP 3623739 B2 20050223

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070103

2004-03-24 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-03-17 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2004-03-17 [DA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2004-03-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040122

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE