Global Patent Index - EP 1024782 A1

EP 1024782 A1 2000-08-09 - USE OF SUBSTANTIALLY AMORPHOUS CELLULOSE NANOFIBRILS ASSOCIATED WITH A POLYHYDROXYLATED ORGANIC COMPOUND IN COSMETIC FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

USE OF SUBSTANTIALLY AMORPHOUS CELLULOSE NANOFIBRILS ASSOCIATED WITH A POLYHYDROXYLATED ORGANIC COMPOUND IN COSMETIC FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON HAUPTSÄCHLICH AMORPHEN, DURCH POLYHYDROXYVERBINDUNGEN ASSOZIIERTEN CELLULOSE-NANOFIBRILLEN IN KOSMETISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE NANOFIBRILLES DE CELLULOSE ESSENTIELLEMENT AMORPHES ASSOCIEES A AU MOINS UN COMPOSE ORGANIQUE POLYHYDROXYLE DANS DES FORMULATIONS COSMETIQUES

Publication

EP 1024782 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98945355 A

Priority

  • FR 9802031 W
  • FR 9713182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769836A1] The use of amorphous cellulose nanofibrils in dry dispersible form together with at least one polyhydroxylated organic compound (polyOH) as texturing agent for cosmetic formulations. The polyOH compound is preferably a carbohydrate or carbohydrate derivative, or a poly-alcohol, especially carboxymethyl cellulose, xanthan gum, guar gum, sorbitol , sucrose, or their mixtures. The cellulose nanofibrils preferably have a crystallinity level below 50% and comprise at least 80% of primary wall cells. The % of polyOH in the total weight of nanofibrils plus polyOH is preferably 5 - 50%, especially 5 - 30%. The nanofibrils may be filled with a carboxylic or polysaccharidic acid, and the mixture may be associated with a co-additive of formula (R<1>R<2>N)COA and a nonionic, anionic or amphoteric surfactant, R<1> and R = H, or 1-10C alkyl; A = H, 1-10C alkyl, or R'<1>R'<2>N; R'<1> and R'<2> = H or 1-10C alkyl

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61Q 3/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 9/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/027 (2013.01); A61K 8/731 (2013.01); B82Y 5/00 (2013.01); A61K 2800/28 (2013.01); A61K 2800/413 (2013.01); A61K 2800/48 (2013.01); A61K 2800/5422 (2013.01); A61K 2800/5424 (2013.01); A61Q 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769836 A1 19990423; FR 2769836 B1 20000310; AU 746945 B2 20020509; AU 9269998 A 19990510; BR 9813118 A 20000822; CA 2307321 A1 19990429; CN 1280486 A 20010117; EP 1024782 A1 20000809; JP 2001520180 A 20011030; WO 9920241 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061117

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DANISCO A/S

2005-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DANISCO FRANCE

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DANISCO FRANCE

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DANISCO FRANCE

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHOD P

2005-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA FOOD

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL