Global patent index - EP 1024790 A4

EP 1024790 A4 2000-10-25 - INJECTABLE BIODEGRADABLE BLOCK COPOLYMER GELS FOR USE IN DRUG DELIVERY

Title (en)

INJECTABLE BIODEGRADABLE BLOCK COPOLYMER GELS FOR USE IN DRUG DELIVERY

Title (de)

INJIZIERBARE BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE BLOCKCOPOLYMERGELE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER ARZNEISTOFFVERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

COPOLYMERES BLOCS EN GELS INJECTABLES ET BIODEGRADABLES SERVANT A ADMINISTRER UN MEDICAMENT

Publication

EP 1024790 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98940801 A

Priority

  • US 9816418 W
  • US 5517497 P
  • US 13096798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907343A1] A system and method for the parenteral delivery of a drug in a biodegradable polymeric matrix to a warm blooded animal as an aqueous liquid with the resultant formation of a hydrogel depot for the controlled release of the drug. The system comprises an injectable biodegradable block copolymeric drug delivery liquid having thermal gelation properties. The copolymer has a gel/sol transition temperature such that, above the body temperature of the animal to which it is administered, it is a solution and when administered and cooled to body temperature it forms a hydrogel. The copolymer is made up of (i) a hydrophobic A polymer block of poly ( alpha -hydroxy acid) and (ii) a hydrophilic B polymer block comprising a poly(ethylene oxide). The drug is released at a controlled rate from the copolymer which biodegrades into non-toxic products. The gel/sol transition temperature and degradation rate can be adjusted by proper selection of the molecular weight and concentration of the poly ( alpha -hydroxy acid) and poly(ethylene oxide) polymer block components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/10; A61K 47/34; C08K 13/02; C08L 67/04; C08L 71/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); C08G 63/06 (2006.01); C08L 71/02 (2006.01); A61K 9/51 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0024 (2013.01); A61K 9/1075 (2013.01); A61K 47/34 (2013.01); C08L 71/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 71/02 + C08L 2666/18

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0717999 A1 19960626 - UNIV MIAMI [US]
  • [X] US 5476909 A 19951219 - KIM GUN P [KR], et al
  • [X] WO 9710849 A1 19970327 - SAM YANG CO [KR], et al
  • [X] MARTINI L ET AL: "MICELLISATION AND GELATION OF TRIBLOCK COPOLYMER OF ETHYLENE OXIDE AND EPSILON-CAPROLACTONE, CLNEMCLN, IN AQUEOUS SOLUTION", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY. FARADAY TRANSACTIONS,GB,ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, vol. 90, no. 13, 7 July 1994 (1994-07-07), pages 1961 - 1966, XP000454914, ISSN: 0956-5000
  • [XP] JEONG B ET AL: "BIODEGRADABLE BLOCK COPOLYMERS AS INJECTABLE DRUG-DELIVERY SYSTEMS", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, vol. 388, no. 6645, 28 August 1997 (1997-08-28), pages 860 - 862, XP002068338, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • See also references of WO 9907343A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907343 A1 19990218; CA 2299393 A1 19990218; EP 1024790 A1 20000809; EP 1024790 A4 20001025; JP 2001517603 A 20011009

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020607

2000-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 9/10 A, 7C 08K 13/02 B, 7C 08L 67/04 B, 7C 08L 71/02 B, 7A 61K 47/34 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT