Global Patent Index - EP 1024792 A1

EP 1024792 A1 2000-08-09 - TOPICAL ANTIFUNGAL COMPOSITION

Title (en)

TOPICAL ANTIFUNGAL COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ANTIFUNGALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ANTIFONGIQUE TOPIQUE

Publication

EP 1024792 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951104 A

Priority

  • AU 9800867 W
  • AU PO983897 A
  • AU PP121798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920250A1] The invention relates to a topical, foamable composition including at least one antifungal agent, said composition characterised in that said at least one antifungal agent is able to penetrate the upper layers of skin and is retained in or on an area to be treated for a prolonged period of time, and in that it has a residual non-volatile component content of less than 25 %. The invention furthermore relates to a method of treating fungal diseases including jock itch, tinea, dandruff and sebborheic dermatitis by applying to the affected area of a patient requiring such treatment the antifungal composition as claimed in any one of claims 1-29.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/12; A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 27/20 (2016.01); A61K 9/12 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/368 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 31/085 (2006.01); A61K 31/135 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/27 (2006.01); A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/4196 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/513 (2006.01); A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/046 (2013.01); A61K 8/33 (2013.01); A61K 8/345 (2013.01); A61K 8/36 (2013.01); A61K 8/361 (2013.01); A61K 8/368 (2013.01); A61K 8/41 (2013.01); A61K 8/46 (2013.01); A61K 8/49 (2013.01); A61K 8/4926 (2013.01); A61K 8/494 (2013.01); A61K 8/4946 (2013.01); A61K 8/4953 (2013.01); A61K 8/4973 (2013.01); A61K 8/602 (2013.01); A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 9/122 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); A61Q 5/006 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/186 (2013.01); Y10S 514/863 (2013.01); Y10S 514/864 (2013.01); Y10S 514/945 (2013.01); Y10S 514/947 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920250 A1 19990429; AT 346588 T 20061215; AU 732456 B2 20010426; AU 9728898 A 19990510; AU PO983897 D0 19971106; AU PP121798 D0 19980129; CA 2306560 A1 19990429; CA 2306560 C 20090714; DE 69836555 D1 20070111; DE 69836555 T2 20070927; DK 1024792 T3 20070115; EP 1024792 A1 20000809; EP 1024792 A4 20010808; EP 1024792 B1 20061129; EP 1692951 A1 20060823; ES 2277394 T3 20070701; JP 2001520184 A 20011030; JP 4917204 B2 20120418; PT 1024792 E 20070131; US 2009149473 A1 20090611; US 2011251146 A1 20111013; US 2012070384 A1 20120322; US 7553835 B1 20090630; US 8026238 B2 20110927; US 8586066 B2 20131119

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151007

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151007

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151009

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151002

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: STIEFEL RESEARCH AUSTRALIA PTY LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140212

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-10-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-05-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-10-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: STIEFEL RESEARCH AUSTRALIA PTY LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2008-07-03 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: STIEFEL RESEARCH AUSTRALIA PTY LTD, AU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD4A

- Effective date: 20080618

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STIEFEL RESEARCH AUSTRALIA PTY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-05-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-09-26 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2277394

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-03-26 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20070400455

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2007-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-03-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061228

2007-01-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69836555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 9/12 20060101AFI20060614BHEP

2006-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/04 20060101ALI20060614BHEP

2006-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/34 20060101ALI20060614BHEP

2006-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61Q 19/00 20060101ALI20060614BHEP

2006-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61P 17/00 20060101ALI20060614BHEP

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONNETICS AUSTRALIA PTY LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020917

2001-08-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 9/12 A, 7A 61K 7/48 B, 7A 61K 7/00 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE