Global Patent Index - EP 1024804 A1

EP 1024804 A1 2000-08-09 - MTP INHIBITORS AND FAT SOLUBLE VITAMIN THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS TO LOWER SERUM LIPID LEVELS

Title (en)

MTP INHIBITORS AND FAT SOLUBLE VITAMIN THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS TO LOWER SERUM LIPID LEVELS

Title (de)

MTP-INHIBITOREN UND FETTLÖSLICHE VITAMIN-THERAPEUTIKA ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES SERUM LIPIDS

Title (fr)

COMBINAISONS THERAPEUTIQUES D'INHIBITEUR DE MTP ET DE VITAMINE LIPOSOLUBLE DESTINEES A REDUIRE LES TAUX DE LIPIDES SERIQUES

Publication

EP 1024804 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918680 A

Priority

  • US 9808269 W
  • US 4540597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850028A1] A pharmaceutical combination formed of an MTP inhibitor and a fat soluble vitamin such as Vitamins E, A, K and/or D, and optionally another cholesterol lowering drug, is provided which is employed in a method for lowering serum lipids, cholesterol and/or triglycerides and thereby inhibiting or treating atherosclerosis, pancreatitis, hyperglycemia and/or obesity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/355; A61K 31/075; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/07 (2006.01); A61K 31/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/355 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/4462 (2006.01); A61K 31/4468 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/59 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 1/18 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/07 + A61K 31/59 + A61K 31/355
  2. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/355
  3. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/07
  4. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/20
  5. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/59
  6. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/12

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850028 A1 19981112; AU 7155998 A 19981127; AU 748608 B2 20020606; CA 2286341 A1 19981112; EP 1024804 A1 20000809; EP 1024804 A4 20010321; JP 2001527551 A 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040216

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/355 A, 7A 61K 31/34 B, 7A 61K 31/075 B, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7A 61K 31/495 B, 7A 61K 31/50 B, 7A 61K 45/06 B, 7A 61P 9/00 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE