Global Patent Index - EP 1024810 A4

EP 1024810 A4 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING RETINAL AND OPTIC NERVE HEALTH

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING RETINAL AND OPTIC NERVE HEALTH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON RETINAL UND DER GESUNDHEIT DES OPTISCHEN NERVES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'OPTIMISER L'ETAT DE SANTE DE LA RETINE ET DU NERF OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 1024810 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98931510 A

Priority

  • GB 9800449 A
  • US 9813038 W
  • US 5083597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900133A1] There is disclosed a method for increasing retinal and optic nerve head blood velocity by topical application of a composition comprising carbonic anhydrase inhibitors and hypotonic xanthan gum to the eye.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 279/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/382 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/54 (2006.01); A61K 31/542 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); C07D 285/10 (2006.01); C07D 495/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9637203 A1 19961128 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [Y] EP 0590786 A1 19940406 - ALCON LAB INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0507224 A2 19921007 - ALCON LAB INC [US]
  • [Y] WO 9316701 A2 19930902 - ALCON LAB INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0033042 A1 19810805 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0036351 A2 19810923 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [XY] RASSAM S M B ET AL: "THE EFFECT OF ACETAZOLAMIDE ON THE RETINAL CIRCULATION", EYE, ROYAL COLLEGE OF OPHTALMOLOGISTS, LONDON, GB, vol. 7, no. PART 5, 1993, pages 697 - 702, XP002059279
  • [XY] CHIOU G C Y ET AL: "EFFECTS OF ANTIGLAUCOMA DRUGS ON OCULAR BLOOD FLOW IN OCULAR HYPERTENSIVE RABBITS", JOURNAL OF OCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC. NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 9, no. 1, 21 March 1993 (1993-03-21), pages 13 - 24, XP000993431, ISSN: 8756-3320
  • See also references of WO 9900133A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900133 A1 19990107; AU 740874 B2 20011115; AU 8162298 A 19990119; CA 2294343 A1 19990107; EP 1024810 A1 20000809; EP 1024810 A4 20030611; JP 2002506461 A 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE