Global Patent Index - EP 1024867 A1

EP 1024867 A1 2000-08-09 - MODULAR EDUCATIONAL GAME

Title (en)

MODULAR EDUCATIONAL GAME

Title (de)

MODULARES LERNSPIEL

Title (fr)

JEU EDUCATIF MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 1024867 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950154 A

Priority

  • FR 9802233 W
  • FR 9713181 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769845A1] The toy consists of hollow coloured plastic modules, each having a square base supporting a three-dimensional figure. The figures can be geometrical, of flora or fauna, such as animals or vegetables, objects such as aircraft, cars or trains, or people. The figures have no sharp corners or edges and have holes which allow them to be filled with a liquid, a solid such as sand or cement, or a foam. The bases have holes in them for joining together with others, and can carry designs or inscriptions of an informative or educational nature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/00697 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00794 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00817 (2013.01); A63F 2009/1296 (2013.01); A63F 2250/04 (2013.01); A63F 2250/0485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920361A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769845 A1 19990423; FR 2769845 B1 20000121; AU 9633298 A 19990510; DE 69810505 D1 20030206; EP 1024867 A1 20000809; EP 1024867 B1 20030102; WO 9920361 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051019

2004-12-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VINCENT JEAN-FRANCOIS

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810505 P 20030206

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2003-01-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL