Global Patent Index - EP 1024904 A1

EP 1024904 A1 2000-08-09 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING A THIN COAT ON THE SURFACE OF A SCREEN OF A CATHODE-RAY TUBE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR APPLYING A THIN COAT ON THE SURFACE OF A SCREEN OF A CATHODE-RAY TUBE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER DÜNNEN SCHICHT AUF DIE OBERFLÄCHE EINES BILDSCHIRMGLASKOLBENS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UNE COUCHE MINCE A LA SURFACE DE L'AMPOULE DE VERRE D'UN TUBE CATHODIQUE

Publication

EP 1024904 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955473 A

Priority

  • DE 19748063 A
  • EP 9806586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748063A1] The invention relates to a device (10) for applying a thin coat consisting of a fluid coating medium on the curved surface (12) of a screen of a cathode-ray tube (11). Said device comprises a rotary table (20) that can be driven rotationally. The rotary table also includes a location (30) for the object (11) to be coated to fix said object in such a way that it cannot rotate and a processing tank (50) surrounding the location (30) and the rotary table (20) that is locked to prevent turning. A first annular gap is provided between the spray ring (60) and the upper part (51) of the processing tank (50) while the location (30) is fitted with a suction cone (32). A second annular gap (37) is formed between said cone and an outer wall of the processing tank (50). An annealing chamber (36) is formed inside said second annular gap. A laminar flow (A) is directed towards the spray ring (60) or the upper part of the processing tank (50). The bottom (54) of the processing tank (50) is connected to a suction device (B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 11/08; H01J 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922877A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748063 A1 19990506; AT 228892 T 20021215; CN 1106231 C 20030423; CN 1278194 A 20001227; EP 1024904 A1 20000809; EP 1024904 B1 20021204; MY 126403 A 20060929; TW 409076 B 20001021; US 6494952 B1 20021217; WO 9922877 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-10-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806563

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 228892

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020301

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI