Global Patent Index - EP 1024910 B1

EP 1024910 B1 2002-12-04 - DEVICE FOR ENCAPSULATING BLANKS IN HIGH-TEMPERATURE METALLIC ALLOYS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ENCAPSULATING BLANKS IN HIGH-TEMPERATURE METALLIC ALLOYS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR KAPSELUNG VON ROHLINGEN AUS METALLISCHEN HOCHTEMPERATUR-LEGIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENCAPSULAGE D'EBAUCHES EN ALLIAGES METALLIQUES HAUTE TEMPERATURE

Publication

EP 1024910 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949898 A

Priority

  • DE 9802369 W
  • DE 19747257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747257A1] The invention relates to a device (10) for encapsulating blanks (11) in high-temperature metallic alloys, especially TiAl alloys, which are subjected to hot forming in an extrusion process. The metal coating consists of at least one first inner sheath (12) which is encompasses the blank (11) tightly but at a distance, and a second, outer sheath (13) which encompasses the inner sheath (12) tightly but at a distance, said first and second sheaths (12, 13) consisting of a metal material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/22; B21C 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 33/004 (2013.01); B21C 23/22 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12229 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12389 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12806 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747257 A1 19990506; DE 19747257 C2 20010426; AT 228896 T 20021215; EP 1024910 A1 20000809; EP 1024910 B1 20021204; US 6420051 B1 20020716; WO 9921667 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130817

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130817

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806564

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130817

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228896 T

- Effective date: 20130817

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806564 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228896 T 20021215

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB