Global Patent Index - EP 1024914 A1

EP 1024914 A1 2000-08-09 - ROLL BENDING MACHINE FOR FORMING A RING-SHAPED PART

Title (en)

ROLL BENDING MACHINE FOR FORMING A RING-SHAPED PART

Title (de)

WALZMASCHINE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINES RINGFÖRMIGEN TEILS

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE ROULAGE POUR PIECE ANNULAIRE A FORMER

Publication

EP 1024914 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950159 A

Priority

  • FR 9802241 W
  • FR 9713224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769859A1] A rolling machine , for producing an annular component (10), comprises a forming mandrel (16), a forming wheel (18), which defines, with the forming mandrel (16), a rolling envelope (19) corresponding with the final form desired for the transverse section of the annular component (10), and two thrust rollers (20) that are applied on the forming mandrel (16) on either part of the rolling envelope (19). In addition, two face control rollers (29) are provided in order to each intervene respectively on the lateral faces (13) of the annular component (10) at a distance from the rolling envelope (19). The face control rollers (29) are arranged between the thrust rollers (20) in the overall volume surrounding the outer contour of them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 1/12 (2006.01); B21H 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 1/12 (2013.01); B21H 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920415A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769859 A1 19990423; FR 2769859 B1 20000128; DE 69805200 D1 20020606; DE 69805200 T2 20021024; EP 1024914 A1 20000809; EP 1024914 B1 20020502; ES 2173631 T3 20021016; WO 9920415 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-06-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021020

2003-06-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-10-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021020

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173631 T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020719

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805200 20020606

2002-05-29 [REG GB FG4L] PUBLICATION LANGUAGE OF GRANTED EUROPEAN PATENT (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2000-08-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE