Global Patent Index - EP 1024933 A1

EP 1024933 A1 2000-08-09 - TENSIVE CUTTING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

TENSIVE CUTTING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

GESPANNTE SCHNEIDEANLAGE

Title (fr)

UNITE DE COUPE SOUS TENSION

Publication

EP 1024933 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918221 A

Priority

  • CA 2317060 A
  • US 9807547 W
  • US 855198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936234A1] A tensive cutting assembly (10) having a tensionable cutting member (20a) removably and interchangeably mounted in a tensive cutting head (30). The tensive cutting assembly may include a means for monitoring tension during set-up of the tensive cutting assembly and sensing failure or breakage during operation. The tensionable cutting member includes a plurality of legs segments (23) connected by a plurality of bends producing a serpentine configuration. The cutting edge of the tensionable cutting member is unsharpened. A tensionable cutting member may be removably mounted to one or both sides of the tensive cutting head. When a tensionable cutting member is mounted to both sides of the tensive cutting head, the first tensionable cutting member presents a first array and the second tensionable cutting member presents a second array rotated at 90 degrees to the first array. The two tensionable cutting members, when employed within a hydraulic cutting device, cut food product having stick configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936234 A1 19990722; AT 352402 T 20070215; AU 7118598 A 19990802; CA 2317060 A1 20010124; CA 2317060 C 20060124; DE 69836973 D1 20070315; EP 1024933 A1 20000809; EP 1024933 A4 20020911; EP 1024933 B1 20070124

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070124

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070425

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-09-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69836973 P 20070315

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2007-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070124

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-09-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 26D 3/18 A, 7B 26D 1/48 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL