Global patent index - EP 1024940 A1

EP 1024940 A1 2000-08-09 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IN-LINE SPLITTING OF PLURAL-COMPONENT FIBERS AND FORMATION OF NONWOVEN FABRICS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IN-LINE SPLITTING OF PLURAL-COMPONENT FIBERS AND FORMATION OF NONWOVEN FABRICS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPALTUNG VON MULTIKOMPONENTFASERN UND HERSTELLUNG VON VLIERSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CLIVAGE EN LIGNE DE FIBRES A PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS ET DE FORMATION DE TISSUS NON TISSES

Publication

EP 1024940 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953364 A

Priority

  • US 9821378 W
  • US 6146097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919131A1] In-line fiber splitting in a spunbond process is achieved by differential heat shrinkage of two or more components of a plural-component fiber, such as a ribbon-shaped bicomponent fiber to produce a nonwoven fabric having superior properties. Two polymers that shrink to substantially different degrees upon application of heat are extruded from an array of orifices (32) of a spinneret (30) as components of plural-component fibers. Ribbon-shaped fibers having alternating first and second components having a difference in heat shrinkage of at least approximately ten percent result in a high degree of rapid separation of the fiber components. The array of plural-components fibers is drawn through an aspirator (36) and attenuated prior to being deposited on a web-forming belt (42) and conveyed to a heater (50) which heats the web to a temperature sufficient to cause differential heat shrinkage of the polymer components, thereby causing the fiber segments formed of the components to separate in less than approximately a second. After fiber separation, the web is bonded to form the nonwoven fabric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 47/14; D02G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/00 (2006.01); B01D 39/16 (2006.01); B29C 47/14 (2006.01); D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D01D 5/30 (2006.01); D01F 8/04 (2006.01); D01F 8/06 (2006.01); D01F 8/14 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2006.01); D04H 1/50 (2006.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/30 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D01F 8/06 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01); D04H 3/016 (2013.01); D04H 3/018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919131 A1 19990422; AU 1076399 A 19990503; EP 1024940 A1 20000809; EP 1024940 A4 20010718; JP 2001519488 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040219

2001-07-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 29C 47/14 A, 7D 02G 3/00 B, 7D 01D 5/30 B, 7D 04H 1/50 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE