Global patent index - EP 1024960 A2

EP 1024960 A2 2000-08-09 - METHOD FOR INSCRIBING THERMOGRAPHIC MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INSCRIBING THERMOGRAPHIC MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHREIBEN VON THERMOGRAFISCHEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ECRITURE SUR MATERIAU THERMOGRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 1024960 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98965136 A

Priority

  • DE 19747302 A
  • EP 9806701 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747302A1] The invention relates to a device (1) for inscribing thermographic material (5). The inventive device (1) comprises a heating means (20) with which the thermographic material (5) is preheated to a temperature, said temperature being lower than a writing temperature, in order to inscribe the thermographic material (5). The thermographic material (5) can be inscribed with a writing means (10) which is distanced from the thermographic material (5) after input of an information signal (s(t)). According to the invention, said writing means (10) have a plurality of individually controllable point sources (30-33; 51-53). The thermographic material (5) can be inscribed in a point-by-point manner with said point sources (30-33; 51-53).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/00; B41J 2/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 2/475 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/4753 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921719A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747302 A1 19990506; EP 1024960 A2 20000809; EP 1024960 B1 20011219; JP 2001520954 A 20011106; US 6325474 B1 20011204; WO 9921719 A2 19990506; WO 9921719 A3 19990708

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081022

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081022

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT HEALTHCARE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT HEALTHCARE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-01-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010315

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL