Global patent index - EP 1025016 A1

EP 1025016 A1 2000-08-09 - PLASTIC SCREW CAP FOR CLOSING A BOTTLE OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

PLASTIC SCREW CAP FOR CLOSING A BOTTLE OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

SCHRAUBKAPPE AUS KUNSTSTOFF ZUM VERSCHLUSS EINER FLASCHE ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

BOUCHON FILETE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE SERVANT A VERROUILLER UN ARTICLE, TEL QU'UNE BOUTEILLE

Publication

EP 1025016 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954405 A

Priority

  • DE 19747299 A
  • EP 9806476 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19847001A1] The sealing face (26) of the sealing lip (24) on the screw cap (2) is conical so that with the cap screwed on it lies upon an external seal edge (28) of the end face (16) of the mouth of the bottle. At least one recess (32) in the form of a radial channel is provided in the conical sealing face and extends from an area which lies outside the seal edge with the cap screwed on tight to the edge (34) of the sealing lip and is in communication with atmosphere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/1661 (2013.01); B65D 41/0428 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921774A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847001 A1 19990429; AU 1153299 A 19990517; BR 9813274 A 20000822; CN 1277590 A 20001220; EP 1025016 A1 20000809; JP 2001520968 A 20011106; TR 200001076 T2 20000821; WO 9921774 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAFETY CAP SYSTEM AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000325

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000325;LV PAYMENT 20000325;SI PAYMENT 20000325