Global Patent Index - EP 1025090 A1

EP 1025090 A1 2000-08-09 - VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

VITRONECTIN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE LA VITRONECTINE

Publication

EP 1025090 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947116 A

Priority

  • US 9819466 W
  • US 5934297 P
  • US 6343897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915508A1] Compounds of formula (I) are disclosed which are vitronectin receptor antagonists and are useful in the treatment of osteoporosis wherein: A is CH2 or O; R<1> is H, halo or C1-6alkyl; R<2> is H, C1-6alkyl or CH2NR''R''; X is O or CH2; Y is (a), (b), (c), (d), (e), (f) or (g); G is NR'', S or O; R' is H, C1-6alkyl, OC1-6alkyl, SC1-6alkyl, NR''R'' or halo; each R'' independently is H or C1-6alkyl; and s is 0, 1 or 2; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/02; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/505; C07D 211/80; C07D 217/12; C07D 277/18; C07D 411/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4418 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/472 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/73 (2006.01); C07D 213/74 (2006.01); C07D 217/12 (2006.01); C07D 217/22 (2006.01); C07D 239/14 (2006.01); C07D 277/20 (2006.01); C07D 277/38 (2006.01); C07D 277/42 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/73 (2013.01); C07D 213/74 (2013.01); C07D 217/22 (2013.01); C07D 239/14 (2013.01); C07D 277/42 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915508 A1 19990401; AP 200001766 D0 19980918; AR 015446 A1 20010502; AU 738433 B2 20010920; AU 9397298 A 19990412; BG 104314 A 20010131; BR 9812340 A 20011218; CA 2303487 A1 19990401; CN 1278250 A 20001227; CO 5011087 A1 20010228; DZ 2609 A1 20030301; EA 200000336 A1 20001030; EP 1025090 A1 20000809; EP 1025090 A4 20001108; HU 0003641 A2 20010328; HU 0003641 A3 20021028; ID 24162 A 20000713; IL 135028 D0 20010520; JP 2001517658 A 20011009; MA 26547 A1 20041220; NO 20001407 A 20000317; NO 20001407 D0 20000317; NZ 503389 A 20020328; OA 11341 A 20031210; PE 122699 A1 20000212; PL 339381 A1 20001218; SK 4082000 A3 20000912; TR 200000721 T2 20001121; TW 513303 B 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031115

2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2000-11-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 213/74 A, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7C 07D 213/73 B, 7C 07D 217/22 B, 7C 07D 239/14 B, 7C 07D 277/42 B, 7C 07D 405/12 B

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000327;SI PAYMENT 20000327