Global Patent Index - EP 1025198 A1

EP 1025198 A1 2000-08-09 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SCENT INTENSIFYING WASHING AND CLEANING DETERGENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING SCENT INTENSIFYING WASHING AND CLEANING DETERGENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DUFTVERSTÄRKTER WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE SERVANT A PREPARER UN PRODUIT LAVANT OU DETERGENT AU PARFUM RENFORCE

Publication

EP 1025198 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955451 A

Priority

  • DE 19746781 A
  • EP 9806513 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746781A1] Production of (laundry) detergents or components with enhanced perfume and a bulk density of over 600 g/l comprises preparing a solid, dry premix from detergent compounds and/or raw materials containing >= 0.1 wt.% perfume and press agglomeration. An Independent claim is also included for the perfume-enhanced (laundry) detergents made in this way.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 3/50; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921955A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746781 A1 19990429; AT 246727 T 20030815; CN 1276829 A 20001213; EP 1025198 A1 20000809; EP 1025198 B1 20030806; ES 2205570 T3 20040501; JP 2001521060 A 20011106; PL 188261 B1 20050131; PL 340036 A1 20010115; US 6228833 B1 20010508; WO 9921955 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-08-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-08-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070605

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20040505

2006-12-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061003

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2004-06-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205570 T3

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809226 P 20030911

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL