Global Patent Index - EP 1025229 A1

EP 1025229 A1 2000-08-09 - CHEMOKINES WITH AMINO-TERMINAL MODIFICATIONS

Title (en)

CHEMOKINES WITH AMINO-TERMINAL MODIFICATIONS

Title (de)

CHEMOKINE MIT AMINO-TERMINALEN MODIFIKATIONEN

Title (fr)

CHEMOKINES AVEC MODIFICATIONS N-TERMINALES

Publication

EP 1025229 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953836 A

Priority

  • US 9822282 W
  • US 95582697 A
  • US 9804002 W
  • US 17571398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920759A1] This invention provides polynucleotides comprising sequences encoding amino-terminal-modified chemokines, the encoded amino-terminal-modified-chemokines, and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/16; A61K 38/19; C07K 14/47; C07K 14/52; C12N 15/19; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/19 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/521 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920759 A1 19990429; AU 1110599 A 19990510; AU 758576 B2 20030327; AU 758576 C 20040429; EP 1025229 A1 20000809; EP 1025229 A4 20030618; JP 2003526315 A 20030909; MX PA00003885 A 20040423

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041004

2003-06-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/19 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/62 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/52 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/24 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/19 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 B

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE