Global Patent Index - EP 1025270 A1

EP 1025270 A1 2000-08-09 - NOVEL WELDABLE ANTI-CORROSIVE ALUMINIUM-MAGNESIUM ALLOY CONTAINING A HIGH AMOUNT OF MAGNESIUM, ESPECIALLY FOR USE IN AUTOMOBILES

Title (en)

NOVEL WELDABLE ANTI-CORROSIVE ALUMINIUM-MAGNESIUM ALLOY CONTAINING A HIGH AMOUNT OF MAGNESIUM, ESPECIALLY FOR USE IN AUTOMOBILES

Title (de)

NEUE SCHWEISSBARE, KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE HOCHMAGNESIUMHALTIGE ALUMINIUM-MAGNESIUM-LEGIERUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR DIE AUTOMOBILANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVEL ALLIAGE ALUMINIUM-MAGNESIUM SOUDABLE, A HAUTE TENEUR EN MAGNESIUM, RESISTANT A LA CORROSION, DESTINE NOTAMMENT A DES APPLICATIONS DANS L'AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1025270 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952346 A

Priority

  • DE 9902491 W
  • DE 19838015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19838015A1] A novel weldable aluminum-magnesium alloy comprising at least 5-6 wt. % magnesium (Mg), 0.05-0.15 wt. % zirconium (Zr), 0.07-1 wt. % manganese (Mn), 0.01-0.02 wt. % titanium (Ti), at least 0.005 wt. % cerium (Ce), 0.05-0.5 wt. % of one or several elements from the scandium group and/or terbium (Tb), whereby at least scandium (Sc) is contained, in addition to aluminium (Al) and unavoidable impurities with a maximum of 0.2 wt. % silicon (Si).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/08 (2006.01); B23K 35/28 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0011231A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838015 A1 20000302; DE 19838015 C2 20021017; AT 216735 T 20020515; CA 2306726 A1 20000302; CA 2306726 C 20080729; CN 1107120 C 20030430; CN 1274391 A 20001122; EP 1025270 A1 20000809; EP 1025270 B1 20020424; ES 2173759 T3 20021016; JP 2002523621 A 20020730; RU 2226567 C2 20040410; US 6315948 B1 20011113; WO 0011231 A1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130417

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173759

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901293

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-29

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216735

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE