Global Patent Index - EP 1025275 A1

EP 1025275 A1 2000-08-09 - METHOD FOR MAKING A COMPOSITE METAL PRODUCT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A COMPOSITE METAL PRODUCT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG EINES METALLISCHEN ERZEUGNISSES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA MISE A COMPOSITION D'UN PRODUIT METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1025275 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98948630 A

Priority

  • EP 98948630 A
  • BE 9800154 W
  • EP 97203241 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909832A1] Adjusting the composition of a metal product by addition of at least one substance makes use of a metal product in the form of a continuous strip (1) being displaced in a vacuum chamber (2) with the substance being applied to the strip and being made to diffuse at least partially into the strip at the moment that it passes into the vacuum chamber by being maintained at a temperature lower than its fusion temperature, but sufficiently elevated to allow the diffusion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/00; C23C 10/00; C23C 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/36 (2006.01); C23C 8/00 (2006.01); C23C 10/00 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 26/00 (2013.01); C23C 8/00 (2013.01); C23C 10/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920808A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909832 A1 19990421; AT 253650 T 20031115; AU 9524898 A 19990510; DE 69819552 D1 20031211; DE 69819552 T2 20040513; DE 69819552 T3 20110609; DK 1025275 T3 20040315; DK 1025275 T4 20110321; EP 1025275 A1 20000809; EP 1025275 B1 20031105; EP 1025275 B2 20101215; ES 2210827 T3 20040701; ES 2210827 T5 20110504; JP 2001520319 A 20011030; JP 4050461 B2 20080220; PT 1025275 E 20040331; US 6361628 B1 20020326; WO 9920808 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151001

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RECHERCHE ET DEVELOPPEMENT GROUPE COCKERILL SA, BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120404

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RECHERCHE ET DEVELOPPEMENT GROUPE COCKERILL SA, BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120404

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120404

2012-04-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-05-04 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Ref Document Number: 2210827

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-04-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20110400476

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-03-21 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2011-03-16 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2011-03-01 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2010-12-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20101215

2010-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE

2009-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

2009-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: HILLE & MUELLER GMBH

2009-09-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

- Effective date: 20040728

2009-09-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HILLE & MUELLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20040805

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: HILLE & MUELLER GMBH

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

- Effective date: 20040728

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HILLE & MUELLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: HILLE & MUELLER GMBH

2004-09-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-09-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HILLE & MUELLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2210827

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-03-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-02-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040400120

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-02-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69819552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE