Global Patent Index - EP 1025301 A1

EP 1025301 A1 2000-08-09 - REINFORCING MATERIAL FOR FOOTWEAR

Title (en)

REINFORCING MATERIAL FOR FOOTWEAR

Title (de)

VERSTÄRKUNGSMATERIAL FÜR SCHUHWERK

Title (fr)

MATERIAU DE RENFORCEMENT POUR CHAUSSURES

Publication

EP 1025301 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951561 A

Priority

  • GB 9803159 W
  • GB 9722272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922060A1] A reinforcing material suitable for use in footwear stiffeners, characterised in that the material comprises consolidated melt-spun fibres of hot-melt adhesive, e.g. polyester melting point about 60 DEG C, combined with bulk fibres, e.g. of 20 mm to 100 mm in length, in a ratio of adhesive fibres to bulk fibres between 20:80 and 80:20 by weight, said fibres having been entangled prior to consolidation under pressure and heat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/54; A43B 13/00; A43B 13/04; A43B 23/07; A43B 23/08; D04H 1/48; D04H 1/60; D04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/08 (2006.01); A43B 23/16 (2006.01); D04H 1/4374 (2012.01); D04H 1/48 (2012.01); D04H 1/485 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 1/60 (2006.01); D04H 5/04 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/485 (2013.01); A43B 23/086 (2013.01); A43B 23/16 (2013.01); D04H 1/4374 (2013.01); D04H 1/48 (2013.01); D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 1/60 (2013.01); D04H 5/04 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922060A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922060 A1 19990506; AU 9752298 A 19990517; BR 9812975 A 20000808; CN 1278877 A 20010103; DE 69819028 D1 20031120; DE 69819028 T2 20040708; EP 1025301 A1 20000809; EP 1025301 B1 20031015; ES 2205562 T3 20040501; GB 9722272 D0 19971217

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041025

2005-10-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051023

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041023

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-10-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041023

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205562 T3

2003-12-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031201

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819028 P 20031120

2003-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT