Global Patent Index - EP 1025323 A1

EP 1025323 A1 2000-08-09 - METHOD FOR STRENGTHENING AND/OR RESTORING REINFORCED OR PRESTRESSED CONCRETE SUPPORTING STRUCTURES, AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STRENGTHENING AND/OR RESTORING REINFORCED OR PRESTRESSED CONCRETE SUPPORTING STRUCTURES, AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERTÜCHTIGUNG UND/ODER SANIERUNG VON STAHLBETON- ODER SPANNBETON-TRAGWERKEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR RENFORCER ET/OU ASSAINIR DES SYSTEMES PORTEURS EN BETON ARME OU EN BETON PRECONTRAINT, ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 1025323 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955408 A

Priority

  • DE 19742210 A
  • EP 9806099 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742210A1] The strip is secured to the surface of the concrete. It is pre stressed only over its middle portion, where it is secured to the concrete by material having a high distortion modulus. A second material with a low distortion modulus is used to secure the two strip ends, which are not pre stressed, to the concrete surface. Adhesive can be used as the material in both cases. The strip can be pre stressed after application of the middle part to the concrete between the points at which the loads act, and before the adhesive at this position has set.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0218 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0251 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0259 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742210 A1 19990325; AT 263296 T 20040415; DK 1025323 T3 20040712; EP 1025323 A1 20000809; EP 1025323 B1 20040331; JP 2001517746 A 20011009; JP 4152070 B2 20080917; US 6385940 B1 20020514; WO 9915744 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 263296 T

- Effective date: 20160924

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-24 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811116

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150903

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-03-06 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: LEONHARDT, ANDRAE UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENI, DE

- Document: AT 263296 T

- Effective date: 20150113

2014-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LEONHARDT, ANDRAE UND PARTNER INGENIEURE VBI A, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEONHARDT, ANDRAE UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENIEURE VBI GMBH, DE

2013-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEONHARDT, ANDRAE UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENI, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEONHARDT, ANDRAE UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENIEURE VBI GMBH, 70192 STUTTGART, DE

- Document: DE 59811116

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59811116

- Representative's name: KATSCHER HABERMANN PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59811116

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KATSCHER HABERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-09-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59811116

- Representative's name: KATSCHER HABERMANN PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEONHARDT ANDRA UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENIEURE

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060924

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060924

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060925

2005-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402227

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811116 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR LI NL SE

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR STRENGTHENING AND/OR RESTORING REINFORCED OR PRESTRESSED CONCRETE SUPPORTING STRUCTURES, AND DEVICE FOR CARRYI

2003-10-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR STRENGTHENING AND/OR RESTORING REINFORCED OR PRESTRESSED CONCRETE SUPPORTING STRUCTURES, AND DEVICE FOR CARRYI

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR LI NL SE