Global Patent Index - EP 1025328 A1

EP 1025328 A1 2000-08-09 - GATE DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (en)

GATE DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (de)

TORANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MECANISME DESTINE A DES BATTANTS DE PORTES

Publication

EP 1025328 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961018 A

Priority

  • DE 9803047 W
  • DE 29718396 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919590A1] The invention relates to a gate drive, comprising a motor drive unit and a guide rail (1) of a carriage (5) which moves along said guide rail. The guide rail (1) is connected to the motor drive unit. A drag connection (54) with a gate wing is connected to the carriage on the driven side and the carriage communicates with the motor drive unit in terms of transmission on the drive side by means of a traction element (2) in the form of an endless cable. The longitudinal cable strands (22, 23) of said traction element (2) pass through two cavities (52, 53) in the carriage (5), one (22) of the two longitudinal strands (22, 23) being joined to the carriage (5). The aim of the invention is to provide a quieter gate drive mechanism of this type. To this end, a cavity (53) in the carriage (5) through which the free longitudinal strand (23) passes is provided with at least one damping arrangement (55) projecting into the cavity (53), in at least one of the lateral walls (57, 58) bordering the cavity (53). The longitudinal cable strand (23) of the traction element (2) which is not joined to the carriage (5) is in contact with the damping arrangement (55) at least when it is caused to deviate laterally in a direction which is perpendicular to its longitudinal direction by a beginning oscillation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/681 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919590A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718396 U1 19990218; AT 211522 T 20020115; EP 1025328 A1 20000809; EP 1025328 B1 20020102; WO 9919590 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802814

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HORMANN K.G. ANTRIEBSTECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802814

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-28

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2002-01-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 211522

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL