Global Patent Index - EP 1025343 A1

EP 1025343 A1 2000-08-09 - DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE RELATIVE ROTATIONAL POSITION OF A SHAFT TO THE DRIVE WHEEL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE RELATIVE ROTATIONAL POSITION OF A SHAFT TO THE DRIVE WHEEL

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR RELATIVEN DREHLAGENÄNDERUNG EINER WELLE ZUM ANTRIEBSRAD

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MODIFICATION RELATIVE DE LA POSITION EN ROTATION D'UN ARBRE PAR RAPPORT AU PIGNON D'ENTREE

Publication

EP 1025343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917979 A

Priority

  • DE 19823619 A
  • EP 9902505 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823619A1] The inventive device for changing the relative rotational position of a shaft to the drive wheel has an adjustment device with two counter-acting pressure chambers, which are impinged upon by a hydraulic pump. In order to achieve an evenly regulated adjustment procedure and to reliably fix the position, the pressure chamber that is connected to the hydraulic pump is impinged upon by pressure at the beginning of the adjustment movement before the opposite pressure chamber attached to the hydraulic tank is relieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2013.01); F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34426 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961759A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823619 A1 19991202; CN 1100197 C 20030129; CN 1266473 A 20000913; EP 1025343 A1 20000809; EP 1025343 B1 20030716; EP 1331367 A2 20030730; EP 1331367 A3 20081119; EP 1331367 B1 20160928; ES 2204124 T3 20040416; JP 2002516947 A 20020611; US 6209497 B1 20010403; WO 9961759 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-10-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2009-02-10 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-11-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: INA-SCHAEFFLER KG

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204124

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906295

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIETHAMMER, BERND

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KNECHT, ANDREAS

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TRZMIEL, ALFRED

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIETHAMMER, BERND

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KNECHT, ANDREAS

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TRZMIEL, ALFRED

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990904

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE