Global Patent Index - EP 1025360 A1

EP 1025360 A1 2000-08-09 - INTERNAL GEAR MACHINE

Title (en)

INTERNAL GEAR MACHINE

Title (de)

INNENZAHNRADMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A ENGRENAGE INTERNE

Publication

EP 1025360 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952712 A

Priority

  • DE 19746983 A
  • EP 9806588 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746983A1] The inner toothed machine, working with a pinion with outer teeth, has a sealing bar (14) as the seal. It has a cross section surface (26) as a closed polygon in a triangle shape. The sides (28-30) of the cross section surface (26) have a convex camber, and the corners (31-33) have a convex rounding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/101 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922142A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746983 A1 19990429; EP 1025360 A1 20000809; EP 1025360 B1 20011128; WO 9922142 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-05-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802272 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE