Global patent index - EP 1025392 A1

EP 1025392 A1 2000-08-09 - A GAS HOTPLATE BURNER

Title (en)

A GAS HOTPLATE BURNER

Title (de)

GASBRENNER FÜR KOCHSTELLEN

Title (fr)

BRULEUR A GAZ POUR ZONE DE CUISSON

Publication

EP 1025392 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97936624 A

Priority

DK 9700353 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911975A1] The power of a gas burner with a crown and cap may traditionally be related to its diameter, i.e. its circumference. The invention provides a burner which not only has peripheral flames but also flames burning nearer the centre. This is obtained by means of a special crown and cap structure and by providing secondary air for the inwards directed flames by means of a scoop plate (S) which takes part of the primary air stream (A) supplied to the burner. The result is a burner which has an appreciably larger power as compared to traditional burners of the same diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F24C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01); F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F24C 3/085 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911975A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911975 A1 19990311; AU 3939497 A 19990322; DE 69724838 D1 20031016; EP 1025392 A1 20000809; EP 1025392 B1 20030910; ES 2206744 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2206744

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-12-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69724838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL