Global Patent Index - EP 1025393 B1

EP 1025393 B1 2001-12-05 - GAS BURNER WITH HANDLE

Title (en)

GAS BURNER WITH HANDLE

Title (de)

GASBRENNER MIT HANDGRIFF

Title (fr)

BRULEUR AVEC POIGNEE

Publication

EP 1025393 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955405 A

Priority

  • DE 19745487 A
  • EP 9805961 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745487A1] The gas burner handle has a connection at one end (2) for fitting to a gas hose and is fitted with a plug-in insert at the opposite end (7), with a retaining pin (10) provided within the handle received in a peripheral slot of the plug-in insert. The plug-in insert has at least one peripheral opening adjacent the peripheral slot for reception of a stop element provided by the handle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/46; B23K 7/10; B23K 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/38 (2006.01); F23D 14/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/38 (2013.01); F23D 14/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745487 A1 19990429; DE 19745487 C2 20000824; AU 1225999 A 19990503; EP 1025393 A1 20000809; EP 1025393 B1 20011205; US 6332773 B1 20011225; WO 9919671 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802375

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090918

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802375 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GAS BURNER WITH HANDLE

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990804

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT