Global patent index - EP 1025399 A1

EP 1025399 A1 2000-08-09 - DEVICE FOR INJECTING STEAM INTO FLOWING WATER IN ORDER TO HEAT THE WATER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR INJECTING STEAM INTO FLOWING WATER IN ORDER TO HEAT THE WATER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM INJEKTIEREN VON DAMPF IN STRÖMENDES WASSER ZUM ZWECKE DES ERHITZENS DES WASSERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SERVANT A INJECTER DE LA VAPEUR DANS DE L'EAU EN ECOULEMENT POUR RECHAUFFER CETTE EAU

Publication

EP 1025399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961036 A

Priority

  • DE 9803120 W
  • DE 29719007 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922178A1] The invention relates to a device for injecting steam into flowing water in order to heat the water. The device comprises an essentially closed housing (404) and a mixing chamber (442) in which the steam is mixed with water which is to be heated. Said mixing chamber is located inside of said housing (404). One respective water inlet opening (416) and one water outlet opening (420) are arranged in the housing (404), whereby the water is fed from the water inlet opening (416) to the water outlet opening (420) via the mixing chamber (442). In addition, the inventive device has a steam chamber (440) located inside the housing and a steam inlet opening (424) which is also located inside said housing (404), whereby the steam is guided from the steam inlet valve (424) to the steam chamber (440). A separating wall (430) is situated between the steam chamber (440) and mixing chamber (442), whereby a plurality of nozzle bores which are arranged (432) in the separating wall (430) are provided for the accelerated entry of the steam into the mixing chamber (442). A fine-meshed structure (434) configured on the side of the separating wall (430) which faces the mixing chamber (442) at least in the area of the nozzle bores (432) is provided in order to reduce the exiting steam bubbles which are accelerated in the nozzle bores. The number of nozzle bore holes (432) and the diameters thereof are designed in such a way that a steam flow rate of 100 m/s is not exceeded in the area of the nozzle bores and/or the nozzle bores (432) are at least partially arranged at varying heights when the device is in an installed state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 1/00; F28B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 1/00 (2006.01); F28B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28B 3/06 (2013.01); B01F 5/0463 (2013.01); B01F 15/063 (2013.01); F24D 1/005 (2013.01); F28C 3/08 (2013.01); B01F 2015/062 (2013.01); F28F 2265/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922178A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719007 U1 19990225; AT 216054 T 20020415; AU 1661799 A 19990517; EP 1025399 A1 20000809; EP 1025399 B1 20020410; WO 9922178 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-01-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040124

2003-10-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-03-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HELMUT BAELZ GMBH

- Effective date: 20030110

2003-03-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HELMUT BAELZ GMBH

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-11-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021114

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803776

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2002-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216054

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011004

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR