Global Patent Index - EP 1025405 A1

EP 1025405 A1 2000-08-09 - HEAT INSULATED TRANSPORT BOX, ESPECIALLY A CONTAINER

Title (en)

HEAT INSULATED TRANSPORT BOX, ESPECIALLY A CONTAINER

Title (de)

WÄRMEISOLIERTER TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER, INSBESONDERE CONTAINER

Title (fr)

CAISSE DE TRANSPORT CALORIFUGEE, NOTAMMENT CONTENEUR

Publication

EP 1025405 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954443 A

Priority

  • DE 19747181 A
  • EP 9806758 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747181A1] The container has its cavity bounded by boundary elements, namely a roof element (2), floor element (3), side walls (4) and end element (22). The boundary elements contain wall cores (13-16) of hard foam plastics such as polyurethane. The rail core is edged with edging beams (5-12) of fiber-reinforced plastics. The boundary elements are fixed rigidly to each other on connecting surfaces in the region of the edge beams. Standard doors can be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/38 (2006.01); B65D 90/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/02 (2013.01); B65D 81/3823 (2013.01); B65D 90/022 (2013.01); B65D 90/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922190A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747181 A1 19990429; AU 1155699 A 19990517; EP 1025405 A1 20000809; EP 1025405 B1 20020717; ES 2181294 T3 20030216; WO 9922190 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071023

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071024

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2007-10-12 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2006-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-10 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181294 T3

2003-01-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020717

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804830 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010910

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL