Global Patent Index - EP 1025425 A1

EP 1025425 A1 2000-08-09 - SPECTROPHOTOMETER SYSTEM

Title (en)

SPECTROPHOTOMETER SYSTEM

Title (de)

SPEKTROPHOTOMETRISCHES SYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SPECTROPHOTOMETRIE

Publication

EP 1025425 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99943781 A

Priority

  • US 9918963 W
  • US 9731798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0014496A1] A spectrophotometer system adapted to be inserted into the side of a compact computer or other computerized devices, as an accessory card which may interface with the computer in accordance with the standards of the Personal Computer Memory Card International Association (PCMCIA) is provided. On this card and disposed along an edge thereof is a spectrophotometer (24). The spectrophotometer optics (26) are connected to a fiber optic cable (32) at the end of which is a light receiving and transmitting opening exposed to the object under test. The card may carry a lamp (36) which is coupled to the fiber optic from the spectrophotometer so as to illuminate the object under test. The card has all of the electronics necessary for spectral measurements, including a microprocessor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01J 3/18; A61B 5/00; G01B 9/02; G01J 3/36; G01J 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/02 (2013.01); G01J 3/0256 (2013.01); G01J 3/0259 (2013.01); G01J 3/0264 (2013.01); G01J 3/0291 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0014496 A1 20000316; AU 5681299 A 20000327; CA 2329196 A1 20000316; EP 1025425 A1 20000809; EP 1025425 A4 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030505

2000-11-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CV US, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE