Global Patent Index - EP 1025455 A2

EP 1025455 A2 2000-08-09 - IMPROVED PASSIVE NEUTRON COINCIDENCE AND MULTIPLICITY COUNTING

Title (en)

IMPROVED PASSIVE NEUTRON COINCIDENCE AND MULTIPLICITY COUNTING

Title (de)

PASSIVE ERFASSUNG VON NEUTRONENKOINZIDENZEN UND VIELFATTEN

Title (fr)

COMPTAGE PERFECTIONNE DES MULTIPLICITES/COINCIDENCES DE NEUTRONS

Publication

EP 1025455 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99969586 A

Priority

  • US 9916956 W
  • US 9441698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0025148A2] In a preferred embodiment, a method of enhancing the neutron coincidence assay of low fissile mass samples, by combining assay precision improvement algorithms with novel background and matrix correction algorithms, to provide lower levels of detection with higher confidence that the reported results are not subject to biases resulting from environmental or sample matrix effects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01T 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 3/00 (2006.01); G01T 1/00 (2006.01); G01T 1/167 (2006.01); G21F 9/00 (2006.01); G21G 1/12 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G01T (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/00 (2013.01); G01T 1/167 (2013.01); G01T 3/00 (2013.01); G21F 9/00 (2013.01); G21G 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0025148 A2 20000504; WO 0025148 A3 20000713; AU 2957600 A 20000515; EP 1025455 A2 20000809; EP 1025455 A4 20010418; JP 2002528727 A 20020903; TW 483006 B 20020411

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040421

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANBERRA INDUSTRIES, INC.

2001-04-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 21G 1/12 A, 7G 01T 3/00 B

2000-10-25 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 21G 1/12 A

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE