Global Patent Index - EP 1025546 A1

EP 1025546 A1 2000-08-09 - PIPELINE PROCESSOR FOR MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS

Title (en)

PIPELINE PROCESSOR FOR MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS

Title (de)

PIPELINE PROZESSOR ZUR MEDISCHEN UND BIOLOGISCHEN BILDANALYSE

Title (fr)

PROCESSEUR PIPELINE DESTINE A L'ANALYSE D'IMAGES MEDICALES ET BIOLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 1025546 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913051 A

Priority

  • CA 9700878 W
  • US 3142396 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9822909A1] A pipeline processor for medical and biological image analysis. The pipeline processor comprises fine-grained processing pipelines, wherein the computational tasks are broken down into fundamental logic operations. The pipeline processor comprises an input stage, a segmentation pipeline stage, a feature extraction pipeline stage, and an output stage. The input stage receives a digitized image of a biological specimen and includes means for conditioning the image prior to the segmentation stage. The segmentation pipeline receives the conditioned image from the input stage and performs a segmenting operation on the image. The output from the segmentation stage is fed to the feature extraction pipeline stage which performs an extraction operation to associate the segmented results with pre-determined features. The extracted features are stored in the output stage and transmitted to another computer which performs classification operations to classify the features according to biological significance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9822909A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9822909 A1 19980528; AU 5044998 A 19980610; AU 741705 B2 20011206; CA 2271868 A1 19980528; EP 1025546 A1 20000809; JP 2001503897 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERACEL INC.

2002-02-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PIPELINE PROCESSOR FOR MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PIPELINE PROCESSOR FOR MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990621

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT