Global Patent Index - EP 1025550 A2

EP 1025550 A2 2000-08-09 - BILL VALIDATOR FOR BANK NOTE HAVING CONDUCTIVE STRIP

Title (en)

BILL VALIDATOR FOR BANK NOTE HAVING CONDUCTIVE STRIP

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG DER ECHTHEIT VON BANKNOTEN, DIE EINEN LEITFÄHIGEN SICHERHEITSFADEN AUFWEISEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VALIDATION DE BILLET POUR BILLETS DE BANQUE MUNIS D'UNE BANDE CONDUCTRICE

Publication

EP 1025550 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98948648 A

Priority

  • CA 9800976 W
  • CA 2218939 A
  • US 10281998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921139A2] A device for validating the authenticity of a document uses changes in capacitance due to the presence of an electrically conductive security thread extending across the document or the presence of a watermark. The device uses a drive arrangement for moving of a document such as a bank note, past a sensing arrangement which senses changes in capacitance due to movement of a security thread or watermark therapist. A frequency generator produces a high frequency time varying oscillator signal and provides this signal to an elongate oscillator electrode extending across the path of movement. A lead elongate measuring electrode is electrically conductive and positioned in front of the oscillator electrode and extends across said path and a trailing elongate measuring electrode is positioned behind the oscillator electrode and extends across the path. The signals from the measuring and the oscillator electrode are provided to a signal processing arrangement. The signal processing arrangement processes the signals relative to detect changes in amplitude and phase shift between the signals caused by a conductive security thread or the watermark passing by the electrodes. Chosen separation distances and using of two sensors placed on opposite sides of bank note reduces the signal intensity variations, caused by the wobbling of the bank note and changes in separation distance of the bank note from the sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/06 (2006.01); G07D 7/02 (2006.01); G07D 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/20 (2013.01); G07D 7/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921139A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921139 A2 19990429; WO 9921139 A3 20000309; AT 259982 T 20040315; AU 740178 B2 20011101; AU 9526598 A 19990510; BR 9812983 A 20000905; CN 1150493 C 20040519; CN 1279799 A 20010110; DE 69821788 D1 20040325; DE 69821788 T2 20041007; EP 1025550 A2 20000809; EP 1025550 B1 20040218; ES 2214732 T3 20040916; JP 2001521230 A 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141020

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141019

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141019

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69821788

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-02-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214732 T3

2004-05-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-05-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821788 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE