Global Patent Index - EP 1025551 A2

EP 1025551 A2 2000-08-09 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CERTIFICATE MANAGEMENT IN SUPPORT OF NON-REPUDIATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CERTIFICATE MANAGEMENT IN SUPPORT OF NON-REPUDIATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HANDHABEN VON ZERTIFIKATEN FÜR NICHTABLEHNUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE CERTIFICAT EN APPUI A LA NON-REPUDIATION

Publication

EP 1025551 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98955052 A

Priority

  • US 9822377 W
  • US 6263097 P
  • US 17592798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921319A2] A non-repudiation mechanism for e-business is provided. E-business covers three areas: Intranet, Extranet, and E-commerce. The invention provides a link between a server which sends Internet requests to the requesting browser, and the application which houses the data and any computing functions. An audit trail is also provided to fix accountability. The invention controls the session between the server and the e-business application. The result is that each and every system request made via Internet technology can be correlated to a specific system user. Management utilities and reports provide the audit trail which provides non-repudiation (accountability).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/38215 (2013.01); G06Q 20/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921319A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921319 A2 19990429; WO 9921319 A3 19990624; AU 1195099 A 19990510; EP 1025551 A2 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ABDALLAH, WAJDI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DALMATOFF, ADAM

2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ABDALLAH, WAJDI

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DALMATOFF, ADAM

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE